Senate | 05/26/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1366.) | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |