|
10/11/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 754, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3370.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2628.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1740.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|