|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 806, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2556.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1812.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|