California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1253 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023