Assembly | 02/01/2024 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2024 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |