|
10/08/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 572, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2762.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 1550.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|