Senate | 07/03/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1412.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |