|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 319, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 3616.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate Rules Suspended (Ayes 30. Noes 8.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2584.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 841.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2023
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 732.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|