California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1268 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill May 30, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023