California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 3, 2024

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 26, 2023
Bill June 13, 2023