California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 13, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023