|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3950.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|