|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3198.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2431.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2140.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1812.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|