Assembly | 02/01/2024 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Luz Rivas. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2023 | Read first time. To print. |