California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill July 10, 2023
Bill May 31, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023