California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2023

Amended

Bill May 31, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023