California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2023

Amended

Bill June 26, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023