|
07/27/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2037.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2080.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|