|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 366, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3446.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2688.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1769.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on A., E., S., & T. and ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|