California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1332 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2023

Amended

Bill August 29, 2023
Bill July 10, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023