|
09/01/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 140, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2137.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1463.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|