California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2023

Amended

Bill September 6, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023