|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 678, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 16. Page 1905.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|