|
10/13/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 838, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2351.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|