|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 688, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 3412.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2643.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 1952.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|