California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2023

Amended

Bill September 8, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023