Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2024
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A., E., S., & T. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|