Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 3228.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2561.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1779.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|