Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/07/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 15. Page 3044.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2023
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 2402.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 1592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|