|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 370, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2926.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2238.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1689.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2023
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|