|
06/29/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1575.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 1008.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|