|
09/22/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 351, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 6.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|