Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 18. Page 1545.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|