Assembly | 01/10/2024 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2024 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2023 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2023 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 12/06/2022 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. | ||
Assembly | 12/05/2022 | Read first time. To print. |