Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 10. Page 3951.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3933.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Kalra.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Kalra.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|