California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1519 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2023

Amended

Bill September 1, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023