California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 20, 2024
Bill September 1, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023