Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 2. Page 2046.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|