Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2141.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2023
|
Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|