Senate | 09/01/2023 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2023 | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2023 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 1604.) | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2023 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 3). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2023 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | Read first time. To print. |