Assembly
|
02/01/2024
|
Died on third reading file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 36. Noes 15. Page 3882.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2024
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Bennett.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bennett.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2023
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|