|
10/10/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 694, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2824.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2181.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1367.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|