California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 23, 2024
Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 27, 2024
Bill June 6, 2024
Bill April 7, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023