California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill June 27, 2024

Chaptered

Bill June 29, 2024

Amended

Bill June 22, 2024
Bill February 1, 2023