California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2023

Amended

Bill September 6, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023