Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3168.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2372.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1598.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|