Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/30/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2023
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 2428.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 1917.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2023
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|