|
10/07/2023
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 375, Statutes of 2023.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2023
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2023
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3528.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2648.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2023
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2023
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1367.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|