Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2024
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 3934.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|