Assembly
|
01/30/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2024
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
10/08/2023
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2023
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2023
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 3456.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2023
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2618.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2023
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 17. Page 2120.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2023
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2023
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|